Alfaro-Ramirez, Armando (CPSO#: 87371)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad Autonoma de Centro America, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 19 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Nov 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Nov 2008