Alfasi, Abdulghader Mohamed Abdulghader (CPSO#: 80636)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 15 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: 6137985555 Ext. 19885
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 12 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULGHADER MOHAMED ABDULGHADER ALFASI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALFASI is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. ALFASI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALFASI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALFASI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALFASI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALFASI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 May 2004 to 20 Jun 2004
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 21 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 15 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pain Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019