Alfred, Alexander Arvo Augustin (CPSO#: 24002)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 25 Jan 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1970
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 25 Jan 1995

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jul 1994
Summary:

 In July 1994, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Alfred guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 34(3)(c) of the Medical Act, 1970, as amended, in that he had been guilty of 
 misconduct in a professional respect or of conduct unbecoming a medical practitioner or of 
 incompetence.  The Committee further found Dr. Alfred guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 26(28) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 
 448/80, as amended, and s. 29(30) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he committed 
 sexual impropriety with a patient.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Alfred be 
 reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that his licence 
 to practice be revoked.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 26 May 1997
Hearing Date(s): Feb 03, 1994