Alfred, Premini Crescenta Pauline (CPSO#: 63736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Malvern Medical Center
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone: (416) 291-7719
Fax: (416) 287-3775
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Premini Alfred Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Alfred ( CPSO# 63736 )

Business Address:
Malvern Medical Center
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PREMINI CRESCENTA PAULINE ALFRED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALFRED is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1992