Algahtani, Abdulhadi Yahya A (CPSO#: 111940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 31 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Khalid University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Neurosurgery
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULHADI YAHYA A ALGAHTANI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALGAHTANI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. ALGAHTANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALGAHTANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALGAHTANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALGAHTANI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALGAHTANI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 26 Aug 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2017