Algawahmed, Hussain Mohammed Hassan (CPSO#: 86098)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2007 to 15 Jun 2007
PEAP - Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2013
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017