Alghamdi, Khalid Hassan Saleh (CPSO#: 95359)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 73953
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khalid Alghamdi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Alghamdi ( CPSO# 95359 )
Dr. E. Khayat ( CPSO# 102303)

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Department of General Surgery
Room C8 114
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3269

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALID HASSAN SALEH ALGHAMDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALGHAMDI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2016 to 26 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2011