Alghamdi, Saleh Ahmed Ali (CPSO#: 106008)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Khalid University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2015 to 23 Jul 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 24 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 06 Sep 2016 to 25 Nov 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 26 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 05 Sep 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Sep 2017