Algom, David (CPSO#: 42119)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, French, Hebrew, Russian, Spanish

Education:The Hebrew University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Algom Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro Unit 1B 700 Industrial Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1G 0Y9 Tel: (613) 738-1242 Fax: (613) 738-0562 Website: http://www.accuro.ca
Date Received: 29 Apr 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Clinical Immunology Effective: 06 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013