Algorashi, Ibrahim Abdullah M (CPSO#: 105281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 27 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Princess Margaret Cancer Center
University of Toronto
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G2M9
Phone: (416) 946-200 Ext. 5455
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IBRAHIM ABDULLAH M ALGORASHI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALGORASHI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALGORASHI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALGORASHI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALGORASHI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALGORASHI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALGORASHI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2015 to 26 Mar 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018