Algoufi, Talal Tourki Youssuf (CPSO#: 69592)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Aug 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 26 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 10 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 11 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2001