Algowizai, Nasser Othman A (CPSO#: 76842)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 01 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: Algowizai, Nasser Othman (used until: 08 May 2006 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3113
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 22118
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASSER OTHMAN A ALGOWIZAI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALGOWIZAI is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. ALGOWIZAI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALGOWIZAI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALGOWIZAI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALGOWIZAI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALGOWIZAI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2001 to 15 Jun 2001
PEAP - Resident - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 09 Jan 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 May 2006 to 29 Jun 2006
PEAP - Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 30 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 16 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 17 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jan 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018