Alhabdan, Sultan Ibrahim A (CPSO#: 111272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 16 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of General Surgery
399 Bathurst Street Room 8 MP 322
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SULTAN IBRAHIM A ALHABDAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALHABDAN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALHABDAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALHABDAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALHABDAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALHABDAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALHABDAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018