Alhabib, Hamad Fayez I (CPSO#: 99026)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015