Alharbi, Naif Faisal N (CPSO#: 110878)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 23 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ibn Sina National College, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 9055259140
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAIF FAISAL N ALHARBI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALHARBI is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. ALHARBI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALHARBI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALHARBI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALHARBI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALHARBI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 02 Sep 2016 to 22 Nov 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 23 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018