Alharbi, Wafaa Muslih Awad (CPSO#: 69490)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1997