Alhashemi, Jamal Abdulwali Mohammed Abdulhaq (CPSO#: 67440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeshore General Hospital
160 Avenue Stillview
Pointe Claire QC  H9R 2Y2
Phone: (514) 630-2225
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jamal A. Alhashemi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 19 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMAL ABDULWALI MOHAMMED ABDULHAQ ALHASHEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALHASHEMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2014