Alhdaib, Abdullah Saud Mohammad (CPSO#: 68527)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1997