Alhodaib, Nasser Ibrahim N (CPSO#: 79680)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 22 Sep 2003
PEAP - Resident - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2003 to 22 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 22 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 22 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 22 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009