Alhouti, Ahmad M A M E (CPSO#: 86025)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2007 to 20 May 2007
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 May 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2011 to 25 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 26 Feb 2012 to 25 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 26 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013