Alhozali, Hanadi Maatouq Saleem (CPSO#: 84126)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2006 to 09 Jun 2006
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012