Alhusayen, Ra'ed Omar S (CPSO#: 80735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Dermatology
2075 Bayview Avenue Room M1 700
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

303 - 1065 Canadian Pl
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Canada
Phone: (905) 625-5600
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Alhusayen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Alhusayen ( CPSO# 80735 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Dermatology
Room M1 700
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
303 - 1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone Number: (905) 625-5600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RA'ED OMAR S ALHUSAYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALHUSAYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PEAP - Resident - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2011