Alhussaini, Anhar Abdullah H (CPSO#: 95041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 May 2011

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Postgraduate Medical Education
Room MDCL 3101A
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 43688
Fax: 905-577-1481
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANHAR ABDULLAH H ALHUSSAINI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALHUSSAINI is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. ALHUSSAINI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALHUSSAINI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALHUSSAINI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALHUSSAINI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALHUSSAINI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 20 May 2011 to 28 Jun 2011
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018