Ali, Abdullah Ali Hussain R H (CPSO#: 80842)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 28 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2004 to 21 Aug 2004
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Aug 2004 to 21 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Aug 2005 to 21 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Aug 2006 to 21 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 06 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011