Ali, Ahmed Isaac Othman (CPSO#: 110615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 20 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Divsion of Cardiac Surgery
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6073
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED ISAAC OTHMAN ALI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2016 to 19 Oct 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018