Ali, Asim (CPSO#: 73831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7190
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Asim Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ali ( CPSO# 73831 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology and
Vision Sciences
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6806

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASIM ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2005