Ali, Asser Adel Ahmed (CPSO#: 89936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health Service
100 Marie-Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2009 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2010 to 25 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2015
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 09 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 09 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 9, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Asser Adel Ahmed Ali,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Ali to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. ASSER ADEL AHMED ALI
                                          ("Dr. Ali")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Ali, certificate of registration number 89936, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7213996 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my family practice. 


            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICRC
                  Committee ("Effective Date").

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor"),
                        for at least nine (9) months (the "Clinical Supervision"), as
                        outlined in the  Clinical Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto
                        as Appendix "A", the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached
                        hereto as Appendix "B", and as set out below:
                  
                        (i)   Moderate Level Supervision
                              1.    I, Dr. Ali, undertake that I will practise under
                                    Moderate Level Supervision for at least three (3)
                                    months; 
                  
                              2.    I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that the Clinical Supervisor
                                    will meet with me no less than bi-weekly for the
                                    Moderate Level Supervision to review a minimum of
                                    twenty (20) patient charts and discuss any concerns
                                    arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                              3.    I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that the Clinical Supervisor
                                    will make recommendations to me for practice
                                    improvements and ongoing professional development and
                                    inquire into my compliance with the recommendations
                                    during the period of Moderate Level Supervision; 
                  
                              4.    I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that the Clinical Supervisor
                                    will perform any other duties, such as reviewing other
                                    documents or conducting interviews with staff or
                                    colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems
                                    necessary to my Clinical Supervision, during the period
                                    of Moderate Level Supervision; 
                  
                              5.    I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that the Clinical Supervisor
                                    will submit written reports to the College at least
                                    once every month, or more frequently if the Clinical
                                    Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice
                                    or compliance with the terms of this Undertaking during
                                    the Moderate Level Supervision; and
                  
                              6.    I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that the Clinical Supervisor
                                    will keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along
                                    with patient identifiers during the period of Moderate
                                    Level Supervision. 
                  
                        (ii)  Low Level Supervision
                              1.    I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that if, after a minimum of
                                    three (3) months of Moderate Level Supervision, my
                                    Clinical Supervisor reports to the College that
                                    satisfactory progress has been made during the period
                                    of Moderate Level Supervision and recommends the level
                                    of supervision be reduced, and if the College approves,
                                    the level of supervision will be reduced to a low level
                                    ("Low Level Supervision");
                  
                              2.    I, Dr. Ali, undertake that I will practise under the
                                    Low Level Supervision for the remainder of the Clinical
                                    Supervision; 
                  
                              3.    I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that the Clinical Supervisor
                                    will meet with me monthly to review a minimum of twenty
                                    (20) patient charts and discuss any concerns arising
                                    from the chart reviews during the period of Low Level
                                    Supervision;
                  
                              4.    I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that the Clinical Supervisor
                                    will make recommendations to me for practice
                                    improvements and ongoing professional development and
                                    inquire into my compliance with the recommendations
                                    during the period of Low Level Supervision; 
                  
                              5.    I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that the Clinical Supervisor
                                    will perform any other duties, such as reviewing other
                                    documents or conducting interviews with staff or
                                    colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems
                                    necessary to my Clinical Supervision, during the period
                                    of Low Level Supervision; 
                  
                              6.    I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that the Clinical Supervisor
                                    will submit written reports to the College at least
                                    once every month, or more frequently if the Clinical
                                    Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice
                                    or compliance with the terms of this Undertaking during
                                    the period of Low Level Supervision; and
                  
                              7.    I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that the Clinical Supervisor
                                    will keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along
                                    with patient identifiers during the period of Low Level
                                    Supervision. 
            . 
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the Investigation, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date the ICR Committee approves this Undertaking.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking
                        in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to
                        continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20)
                        days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in
                        the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable
                        to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College
                        within that time.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Ali, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(d) and/or
                        (e) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Ali, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (5)(f) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the Public
                        Register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B",
                        and complete any additional professional education recommended by
                        my Clinical Supervisor. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to
                        the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to complete the Professional Education within
                        twelve (12) months of the Effective Date.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice
                  (a)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Education Program set out in section (6) above, I
                        will submit to a Reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment")
                        by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the
                        "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may
                        include a chart review, direct observation of my care, interviews
                        with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any
                        other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ali, understand and agree that if I am of the view that any
                        of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR Committee
                        will consider my submissions and make a determination regarding
                        whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable
                        and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (7)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Ali, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the Public Register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (7)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 
                  (a)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ali, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ali, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
                  this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to
                  any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register
                  (a)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ali, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
                        posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Ali was the subject of a College investigation into
                              whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
                              incompetent. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                                    *     Dr. Ali will practise under the guidance of a
                                          Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for
                                          nine (9) months. 
                                    *     Dr. Ali will engage in professional education.
                                    *     Dr. Ali's practice will be reassessed by an
                                          assessor selected by the College within six (6)
                                          months of the end of the period of Education
                                          Program.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Ali, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (6) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Ali, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Ali, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates my
                  completion of the professional education set out in section (6) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (6) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 4, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Asser Adel Ahmed Ali to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 9, 2017:

Dr. Ali was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Ali will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for nine (9) months.

Dr. Ali will engage in professional education.

Dr. Ali’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Education Program.