Ali, Azra (CPSO#: 73356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6165
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Azra Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ali ( CPSO# 73356 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Emergency Department
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Oct 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AZRA ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 27 May 1999 to 23 Jun 1999
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2002