Ali, Humaira Haleem (CPSO#: 84857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
144-499 Main Street South
Brampton ON  L6Y 1N7
Phone: (905) 796-6570
Fax: (905) 796-3977
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St.Joseph's Health Care
100 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5H8
Canada
Phone: (519) 824-6000
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Humaira H. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ali ( CPSO# 84857 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
100 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5H8
Phone Number: (519) 824-6000

Business Address:
144 - 499 Main Street South
Brampton ON  L6Y 1N7
Phone Number: (905) 796-6570

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUMAIRA HALEEM ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008