Ali, Humera (CPSO#: 62438)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1991


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
904 7th Avenue
7th floor
Seattle WA  98104
United States
Phone: (206) 860-2302
Fax: (206) 860-4751

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Washington


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. HUMERA ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 1996 to 31 Mar 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991