Ali, Idris Mohamed (CPSO#: 61807)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Garyounis University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 1992