Ali, Iftikhar (CPSO#: 87942)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010