Ali, Karim Firdous (CPSO#: 99307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Aug 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Ziauddin Medical University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General
Niagara Health System
Department of Internal Medicine
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karim F. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ali ( CPSO# 99307 )

Business Address:
St. Catharines General
Niagara Health System
Department of Internal Medicine
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Aug 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 07 Aug 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Karim Firdous Ali may practise medicine independently in internal medicine
            and infectious diseases.