Ali, Michael Imran (CPSO#: 89507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Guyana, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1450 Highway 2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone: (905) 721-6154
Fax: (905) 721-6190
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ali ( CPSO# 89507 )

Business Address:
1450 Highway 2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-6154

Business Address:
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL IMRAN ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010