Ali, Muhammad (CPSO#: 85474)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Apr 2013

Expiry Date:  01 Apr 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Apr 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Baluchistan, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Haematology Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 201438
Fax: (416) 813-5327
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Paediatric Haematology/Oncology Effective: 02 Apr 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Apr 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 05 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 06 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Apr 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Muhammad Ali may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics, Division of Haematology-Oncology, at the University of
                        Toronto, in which Dr. Ali holds an academic appointment at the rank
                        of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or  when  Dr.  Ali  no  longer  holds  the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a report indicating that Dr. Ali's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill,  judgment,  professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not receive an annual report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes  a decision about Dr. Ali's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration  of  the  practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  April  2,  2013.   In accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not  extended  by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on April 1, 2020.