Ali, Naeem Mohammad Faseeh (CPSO#: 74308)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 1999 to 23 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 20 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 25 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2001 to 23 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008