Ali, Pervez Syed (CPSO#: 62414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
34 Kern Road
North York ON  M3B 1T1
Phone: (416) 495-9902
Fax: (416) 445-9692
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pervez S. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ali ( CPSO# 62414 )

Business Address:
Unit 5
34 Kern Road
North York ON  M3B 1T1
Phone Number: (416) 495-9902

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Grand Cayman

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PERVEZ SYED ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1991