Ali, Sherese (CPSO#: 74742)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Calgary, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 509
439 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Y8
Phone: (416) 938-1278
Fax: (647) 277-9010
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERESE ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2014