Ali, Syed Nasir (CPSO#: 63113)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
168 Essex Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 4R9
Phone: (519) 337-7535
Fax: (519) 337-7536
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. N. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ali ( CPSO# 63113 )

Business Address:
168 Essex Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 4R9
Phone Number: (519) 337-7535

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYED NASIR ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1992