Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ali, Vasima Ashraf (CPSO#: 33729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Aligarh Muslim University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite G06
3850 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3T6
Phone: (416) 298-2988
Fax: (416) 298-3140
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ali ( CPSO# 33729 )

Business Address:
Suite G04
3850 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3T6
Phone Number: (416) 298-2988

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VASIMA ASHRAF ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1982