Ali, Yaser M A Hussain Gh (CPSO#: 76677)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Kuwait University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 21 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 20 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 04 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2017