Ali-Ahmad, Noha Yussef (CPSO#: 111128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:American University of Beirut, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Absolute Avenue
Mississauga ON  L4Z 0A9
Phone: (905) 897-5437
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3885 Duke of York Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5B 3Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 366-4441
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

222 Dixon Road
Etobicoke ON  M9P 3S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 850-8947
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noha Ali-Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ali-Ahmad ( CPSO# 111128)

Business Address:
106 - 222 Dixon Road
Toronto ON  M9P 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 850-8947

Business Address:
4033 Hurontario Street
Suite 1
Mississauga ON  L4Z 0B8
Phone Number: (905) 897-5437

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Nov 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Noha Yussef Ali-Ahmad may practise paediatrics while under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College, at the
                  following locations:

                  (i)   50 Absolute Avenue, in Mississauga, Ontario; 
                  (ii)  3885 Duke of York Boulevard, in Mississauga, Ontario; and
                  (iii) 222 Dixon Road, in Etobicoke, Ontario. 
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires eighteen months
                  from the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Ali-Ahmad's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not
                        provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if
                        the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to
                        supervise Dr. Ali-Ahmad's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of  Dr. Ali-Ahmad's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on November 1, 2016, and will expire on or
                  before April 30, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.