Alibhai, Karim Nurali (CPSO#: 78047)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Alberta, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 09 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2009