Alibhai, Shabbir (CPSO#: 66580)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
Room EN 14-214
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5125
Fax: (416) 595-5826
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
550 University Avenue
1st Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 4200
Fax: (416) 597-7074
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Alibhai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Alibhai ( CPSO# 66580 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Room EN14-214
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5125

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHABBIR ALIBHAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIBHAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1997