Alibrahim, Ammar Mohammed I (CPSO#: 99992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M4B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5366
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMMAR MOHAMMED I ALIBRAHIM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALIBRAHIM is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALIBRAHIM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALIBRAHIM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALIBRAHIM shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALIBRAHIM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALIBRAHIM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 23 Jun 2013
PEAP - Resident - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018