Alidrisi, Maha Ahmed Alabed (CPSO#: 73176)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 1998 to 15 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 1999 to 15 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001