Alikhan, Qasim Raza (CPSO#: 71083)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
303 - 770 Broadview Ave
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 722-9900
Fax: (613) 722-9100
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alikhan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Alikhan ( CPSO# 71083 )

Business Address:
303 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 722-9900

Business Address:
Queensway-Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
Suite B1
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 722-9900


Corporation Name: Dr. Alikhan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Alikhan ( CPSO# 71083 )

Business Address:
330 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 722-9900

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 17 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. QASIM RAZA ALIKHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIKHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001