Alikouzehgaran, Maryam (CPSO#: 82179)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Feb 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alberta Hospital Edmonton
PO Box 307
Edmonton AB  T5J 2J7
Phone: (780) 342-5465
Fax: (780) 342-5411

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2005 to 05 Apr 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Feb 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Maryam  Alikouzehgaran  may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry,
            only.