Aliu, Teuta (CPSO#: 87865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Albanian, Croatian, English

Education:UNIVERSITY OF PRISTINA, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lincoln Medical Centre
4413 Ontario Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B5
Phone: (905) 563-1212
Fax: (905) 563-4404
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Teuta Aliu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Aliu ( CPSO# 87865 )

Business Address:
Lincoln Medical Centre
4413 Ontario Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 563-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TEUTA ALIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 11 Feb 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2008 to 19 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2008 to 19 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010