Aliu-Berisha, Shpresa (CPSO#: 91307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Albanian, Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:UNIVERSITY OF PRISTINA, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone: (519) 752-0970
Fax: (519) 753-3988
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Regina Gardens
Long Term Care Residence
536 Upper Paradise RD
Hamilton ON  L9C 5E3
Canada
Phone: (905) 383-2970
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shpresa Aliu-Berisha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Aliu-Berisha ( CPSO# 91307 )

Business Address:
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J3
Phone Number: (519) 753-8666

Business Address:
Regina Gardens
Long Term Care Residence
536 Upper Paradise Road
Hamilton ON  L9C 5E3
Phone Number: (905) 383-2970

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHPRESA ALIU-BERISHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIU-BERISHA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011